Jerome M. Selby
Occupation: Municipal and Business Consultant Born: Wheatland, Wyoming, September 4, 1948 Education: MPA, Boise State University (1978) MA, Educational Administration, College of Idaho (1974) BS in
Occupation: Municipal and Business Consultant Born: Wheatland, Wyoming, September 4, 1948 Education: MPA, Boise State University (1978) MA, Educational Administration, College of Idaho (1974) BS in
Occupation: Executive Producer Born: Boston, Massachusetts, December 15, 1962 Education: Magistri Artibus Liberalibus, Harvard University (1997) BA, Clark University (1985) Certifications: Accredited Assessor #666, Massachusetts Career:
Occupation: Librarian (Retired) Born: Boston, Massachusetts June 27, 1943 Education: MLS, Peabody College, Nashville, TN (1966) BS, Boston College, Chestnut Hill, MA (1965) Career: General Reference, Local
Occupation: Owner; President Education: BA in Journalism, Texas Tech University (1988) Career: Owner, President, Nomiss Communication (2005-Present) Career Related: Former Affiliate, National Court Appointed Special Advocate Association;
Occupation: Foundation Executive; Blogger Born: Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, March 15, 1963 Education: BA in Political Science, The George Washington University, with Special Honors (1985) Career: Editor-At-Large, NewsBusters.org, Media
Occupation: Botanist; Educator (Retired) Born: Columbus, Ohio, December 15, 1942 Education: PhD in Botany, Indiana University (1969) BS in Biological Science and History-Government, Ohio University (1964)
Occupation: Professor Emeritus Education: PhD in Physics, University of Colorado at Boulder (1976) Coursework, Imperial College London (1973-1974) MS in Physics, University of Colorado at Boulder
Occupation: Deputy Secretary of Education; Commissioner for Libraries (Retired) Born: Nyack, New York, September 24, 1953 Education: DArts in English, Saint John’s University, Queens, NY (2006) MA
Occupation: Psychologist; Neuropsychologist Education: PhD, University of Vermont (1972) MA, University of Vermont (1969) BA, University of New Hampshire, cum laude (1967) Certifications: Certified Clinical Anxiety Treatment
Occupation: Advertising Executive Born: Paducah, KY, June 19, 1933 Education: Coursework, Phoenix Junior College (Now Phoenix College), Phoenix, AZ (1978-1980) Diploma in Business, Bowling Green State University,
Occupation: Director of Research and Development Administration (Retired) Born: New York City, June 16, 1929 Education: MS in Library Science, Columbia University (1952) BA in Philosophy/Biology, Iona
Occupation: Conceptual Artist; Sculptor Born: Ellenville, New York, November 19, 1942 Education: Complete Graduate Coursework in Fine Arts, New Paltz, SUNY (1965-1972) BS, New Paltz, SUNY
Occupation: Doctor Education: MD, School of Medicine, University of Nevada (1992) Certifications: Licensed to Practice Medicine, State of California (1994) Career: Internal Medicine/Pediatrics Doctor, Dignity Health Medical
Occupation: Investment Banking Executive Born: Cedar Rapids, Iowa, November 15, 1943 Education: MBA, Harvard University, Cambridge, MA, High Distinction (1971) BS in Nuclear Physics, Massachusetts Institute of
Occupation: Information Systems Educator; Consultant Born: Chicago, Illinois, January 26, 1944 Education: PhD in Accounting, University of Illinois (1973) MS in Accounting, University of Illinois (1967) BS
Occupation: Integrative Medicine Specialist; Anesthesiologist Born: Peoria, Illinois Education: MD, Wake Forest University (1962) BS, Wake Forest University (1957) AA, Mars Hill College (1955) Certifications: Diplomate,
Occupation: Pharmaceutical Company Executive Born: New York City, September 8, 1951 Education: JD, cum laude, Harvard University (1983) MD, Georgetown University (1975) BA, Columbia University (1971)
Occupation: President; Research Scientist; Engineer Born: Bluefield, West Virginia, October 23, 1936 Education: PhD in Theoretical and Applied Mechanics and Biomechanics, West Virginia University (1970) Graduate,
Occupation: Film Editor; Educator Born: San Francisco, California, June 27, 1947 Education: Honorary Doctorate, Academy of Art University (2016) MA, California State University, San Francisco (1973) BA,
Occupation: Forensic Attending Education: Fellowship in Forensic Psychiatry, University of California Los Angeles (2005-2006) Minority Fellow, Cultural Research in Psychiatry, American Psychiatric Association (2002-2005) Fellowship in Psychodynamic
Occupation: Trucking Executive; Writer Born: Green Bay, Wisconsin, September 29, 1932 Education: DMin, Graduate Theological Foundation (1996) MA, University of Wisconsin-Green Bay (1982) BS, University of Wisconsin-Madison,
Corporate Address:
350 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556
Alternate Address:
51 John F Kennedy Pkwy Fl West
Short Hills, NJ 07078-2704
Phones:
1 (908) 673-0100
1 (908) 279-0100
Toll Free: 1 (844) 394-6946
E-mail:
[email protected]
or
[email protected]
Hours:
Mon – Thu: 9:00 AM – 5:30 PM
Fri: 9:00 AM – 4:30 PM
Marquis Who’s Who was established in 1898 and promptly began publishing biographical data in 1899. More than 125 years ago, our founder, Albert Nelson Marquis, established a standard of excellence with the first publication of Who’s Who in America.